28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Stock Returns |
No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
31/08/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). |
SLS/194710 |
31/03/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48. No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear. |
SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902. |
SLS/194906 |