Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2673 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16079 Week
» 69095 Month
» 188622 Year
» 3215475 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4026 |
m/e |
09/1909 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
Star |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
178 |
Works Number |
2370 |
To Service |
During 09/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/02/1950 off Taunton (83B) |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1909 |
TN |
|
Taunton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/02/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
83B |
Taunton |
m/e |
28/02/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1913 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1932 |
'Elbow' pattern outside steam pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4026, name: KING RICHARD Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2370 |
|
|
05/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1927 |
Naming |
Renamed 'THE JAPANESE MONARCH' |
|
|
11/1927 |
Naming |
Renamed 'JAPANESE MONARCH' |
|
|
11/1927 |
Naming |
Renamed 'JAPANESE MONARCH' |
|
|
10/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: 'Elbow' pattern outside steam pipes fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Taunton (TN) |
|
|
20/02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4026 from Taunton (83B) |
|
|