Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34091 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3351 |
09/1949 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1949 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'Pacific's' in the new green livery with the crest on the tender are: Nos. 34091 Weymouth and 34092 Wells. Under construction are: Nos. 34093/94/96/98 and 'Leader' Class Nos. 36002/03. 'AlX' No. 32662 left Works on 12/9 painted black and fully lined. One of the Vulcan goods tenders was lined out but the lining has since been painted over. Apparently it was mistaken for the tender belonging to 'K' Class No. 32341, which now has its own tender complete with crest. |
SLS/194910 |
30/09/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
Locomotives ex Works in late September included: Nos. 35018/25 painted blue, Nos. 30449, 30741, 34061 painted dark green, Nos. 30323, 30730/32, 30905, 32077/86 painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 30458 Ironside, 30840/42, 32085, 90772 are unlined black. In addition to the above, Nos. 35009/17 are painted blue and Nos. 34091-92 are very dark green. |
SLS/194911 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (Ex-Works) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34091 Built at Brighton Works Tender fitted: LP Series 2 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
20/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34091 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|