Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1680 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19483 Week
» 72499 Month
» 192026 Year
» 3218879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34080 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3331 |
20/08/1948 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3278 |
13/11/1957 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3290 |
04/1964 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
RAM |
|
Ramsgate (New) |
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/09/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
5w/e |
04/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
q/e |
14/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34080 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
20/08/1948 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3331 |
|
|
13/11/1957 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3278 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3290 |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34080 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|