Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1606 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15012 Week
» 68028 Month
» 187555 Year
» 3214408 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34075 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1965 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3325 |
09/06/1948 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3290 |
14/09/1957 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3278 |
04/1964 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34075, name: 264 SQUADRON Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
09/06/1948 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3325 |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
09/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
14/09/1957 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3290 |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3278 |
|
|
08/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34075 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|