31/05/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. |
SLS/194807 |
25/10/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). |
SLS/195112 |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Kingmoor MPD |
In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. |
SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 |
Derby Works |
Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. |
SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 |
Birmingham Excursions |
On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. |
SLS/196304 |
31/05/1964 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. |
SLS/196407 |
14/09/1964 |
Southern engines for storage |
34015/9/33/42/77/9, 35005/10/2/22, 73083/7, 76019 are to be stored after transfer, (In view of large scale moves to a few sheds only, the usual arrangement for such transfers has not been used this time. |
SLS/196410 |