Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3643 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17049 Week
» 70065 Month
» 189592 Year
» 3216445 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C112 |
m/e |
10/1945 |
British Railways |
34012 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
01/11/1945 |
LAUNCESTON |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 11/12/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Jan 1958 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3263 |
20/10/1945 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3271 |
30/06/1947 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 2 |
3368 |
04/12/1957 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1946 |
\"West Country\" Namings |
21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. |
SLS/194605 |
26/03/1946 |
Surbiton |
903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Locomotives Miscellany |
More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
\"West Country\" Namings |
21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. |
SLS/194605 |
30/06/1948 |
General |
Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C112 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
20/10/1945 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3263 |
|
|
01/11/1945 |
Naming |
Named 'LAUNCESTON' by Alderman G E Trood JP (Mayor) at Launceston |
|
|
30/06/1947 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3271 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34012 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
04/12/1957 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3368 |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (70E) |
|
|
10/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
11/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34012 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|