|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 25/05/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 4 days | Non Classified | Driving axle examined for flaws |
||
Eastleigh Works | 27/08/1953 | 25/09/1953 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 29/11/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 55 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 27/06/1956 | 21/07/1956 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 21/10/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 34 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) | 08/05/1959 | 31/05/1959 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 10/06/1960 | 09/07/1960 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 09/05/1962 | 26/05/1962 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 29/04/1963 | 08/06/1963 | 41 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 22/07/1963 | 23/07/1963 | 2 days | Adjustment | |||
Eastleigh Works | 29/10/1963 | 23/11/1963 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 12/12/1963 | 13/12/1963 | 2 days | Non Classified | |||
Eastleigh Works | 21/08/1964 | 18/09/1964 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 24/03/1966 | 21/04/1966 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1946 | \"West Country\" Namings | 21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. | SLS/194605 |
26/03/1946 | Surbiton | 903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. | SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 | Locomotives Miscellany | More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. | SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 | \"West Country\" Namings | 21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. | SLS/194605 |
01/02/1949 | Brighton Works | Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. | SLS/194903 |
07/03/1949 | Brighton Works | Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. | SLS/194904 |
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C101 Built at Brighton Works |
||
21/06/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3251 | ||
10/07/1945 | Naming | Named 'EXETER' by Alderman V Thompson (Mayor) at Exeter Central | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
07/02/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3296 | ||
03/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34001 | ||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. Work undertaken: Driving axle examined for flaws |
||
27/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1953. Dep: 25/09/1953. | ||
29/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. | ||
27/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/06/1956. Dep: 21/07/1956. | ||
08/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
21/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
23/11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3369 | ||
08/05/1959 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1959. Dep: 31/05/1959. | ||
10/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/06/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960. | ||
10/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
09/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962. | ||
29/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1963. Dep: 08/06/1963. | ||
22/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Adjustment) - Arr: 22/07/1963. Dep: 23/07/1963. | ||
29/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1963. Dep: 23/11/1963. | ||
12/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 12/12/1963. Dep: 13/12/1963. | ||
21/08/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1964. Dep: 18/09/1964. | ||
14/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
18/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
24/03/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1966. Dep: 21/04/1966. | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34001 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |