Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2963 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16369 Week
» 69385 Month
» 188912 Year
» 3215765 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
115 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
319 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
210 |
on |
03/12/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5389 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 04/03/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Total Mileage |
718,902 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 115 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5389 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 319 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
03/12/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 210 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
04/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 210 |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|