Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 940 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18743 Week
» 71759 Month
» 191286 Year
» 3218139 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3178 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3150 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
172 |
Works Number |
2287 |
To Service |
During 11/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/01/1951 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1907 |
STJ |
|
Severn Tunnel Junction |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
LA |
|
Laira |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/01/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LA |
Laira |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
WDN |
83D |
Laira |
on |
15/01/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3178 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2287 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
15/01/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3178 |
|
|