Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3446 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16852 Week
» 69868 Month
» 189395 Year
» 3216248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3176 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3150 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
172 |
Works Number |
2285 |
To Service |
During 11/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/11/1957 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 14 dys |
Total Mileage |
934,547 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1907 |
STJ |
|
Severn Tunnel Junction |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/11/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3176 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2285 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
14/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3176 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|