Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1782 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15188 Week
» 68204 Month
» 187731 Year
» 3214584 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
95 |
m/e |
07/1908 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
297 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 95 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5096 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 297 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 297 from Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|