Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14839 Week
» 67855 Month
» 187382 Year
» 3214235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2926 |
on |
26/09/1907 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
Saint |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
170 |
Works Number |
2274 |
To Service |
Mon 26/09/1907 to Old Oak Common (PDN) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/09/1951 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1909 |
D2 boiler fitted |
11/1910 |
D4 boiler fitted |
11/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1934 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2926, name: SAINT NICHOLAS Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2274 Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
04/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: D2 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: D4 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
10/09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2926 |
|
|