Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
58 |
m/e |
07/1908 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
292 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5131 |
To Service |
During 07/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 10/04/1952 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Total Mileage |
660,238 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MTHR |
Merthyr Tydfil |
4w/e |
23/03/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 58 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5131 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 292 |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dowlais Central (rhy) |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cae Harris (Dowlais) (CH) |
|
|
10/04/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 292 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|