Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 4257 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17663 Week
» 70679 Month
» 190206 Year
» 3217059 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2869 |
m/e |
10/1918 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
28xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
210 |
Works Number |
2775 |
To Service |
During 10/1918 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1959 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2869 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2775 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CHR) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
15/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2869 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|