|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2834 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2393 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exeter (EXE) | ||
07/1947 | Modification | Modification: Converted to oil burnng | ||
07/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4808 | ||
01/1950 | Modification | Modification: Oil burning equipment removed | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2834 | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
23/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) | ||
27/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Didcot (81E) | ||
05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2834 | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |