Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 869 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18672 Week
» 71688 Month
» 191215 Year
» 3218068 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2820 |
m/e |
12/1905 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
28xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
155 |
Works Number |
2124 |
To Service |
During 12/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/11/1958 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2820 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2124 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
17/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2820 |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|