Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 897 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14303 Week
» 67319 Month
» 186846 Year
» 3213699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2786 |
|
01/1901 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
2721 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
129 |
Works Number |
1892 |
To Service |
During 01/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 08/12/1949 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1901 |
SPM |
|
St Philips Marsh |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1914 |
B4 boiler fitted |
08/1919 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Horwich Works |
|
21/04/1948 |
|
|
Unknown Regime |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2786 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1892 |
|
|
06/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
21/04/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Horwich Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 21/04/1948. |
|
|
08/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2786 |
|
|