Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4070 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17476 Week
» 70492 Month
» 190019 Year
» 3216872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2665 |
|
09/1902 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Aberdare |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
135 |
Works Number |
1953 |
To Service |
During 09/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/01/1948 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1902 |
OXY |
|
Oxley |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/01/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
OXY |
Oxley |
w/e |
02/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
OXY |
Oxley |
4w/e |
22/03/1947 |
WDN |
OXY |
Oxley |
m/e |
31/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1912 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1925 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2665 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1953 |
|
|
09/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2665 |
|
|
20/03/1948 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|