Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 932 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14338 Week
» 67354 Month
» 186881 Year
» 3213734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2631 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Aberdare |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
131 |
Works Number |
1918 |
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/09/1947 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1901 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/09/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
WOS |
Worcester |
m/e |
30/09/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1917 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2631 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1918 |
|
|
09/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
27/09/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2631 |
|
|
01/11/1947 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|