Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 258 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15870 Week
» 114515 Month
» 317179 Year
» 3344032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1490 |
m/e |
10/1898 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
1490 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
114 |
Works Number |
1702 |
To Service |
During 10/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1907 (Disposed of to Ebbw Vale Steel, Iron & Coal Co.) |
Withdrawal Notes |
Disposed of to Ebbw Vale Steel, Iron & Coal Co. |
Service Life |
9 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy |
Total Mileage |
190,910 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1929 |
|
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Swindon Works |
07/09/1899 |
|
05/10/1899 |
30 days |
Light Repair |
|
|
Swindon Works |
27/06/1900 |
|
20/12/1900 |
176 days |
General |
|
18855 |
Swindon Works |
21/10/1901 |
|
07/10/1902 |
354 days |
Unknown Regime |
|
34167 |
Swindon Works |
26/10/1904 |
|
03/02/1905 |
100 days |
General |
|
81052 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1490 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1702 |
|
|
05/10/1899 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Dep: 05/10/1899. Stopped on 07/09/1899 |
|
|
20/12/1900 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Dep: 20/12/1900. Stopped on 27/06/1900 |
|
|
07/10/1902 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Dep: 07/10/1902. Stopped on 21/10/1901 |
|
|
10/10/1902 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/11/1902 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
13/12/1902 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
07/08/1903 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/03/1904 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
03/02/1905 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Dep: 03/02/1905. Stopped on 26/10/1904 |
|
|
08/12/1906 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/1907 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1490 |
|
|
1929 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|