Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3779 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17185 Week
» 70201 Month
» 189728 Year
» 3216581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4600 |
on |
02/12/1913 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1918 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/12/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4600 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2551 Allocated to Swindon Stock shed (SW Stock) |
|
|
05/02/1914 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
11/05/1914 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) |
|
|
13/06/1914 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
20/05/1915 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) |
|
|
12/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
28/01/1919 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pembroke Dock (PDK) |
|
|
27/09/1919 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM) |
|
|
29/10/1919 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pembroke Dock (PDK) |
|
|
13/09/1922 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
18/05/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon Stock shed (SW Stock) |
|
|
26/06/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
25/07/1925 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4600 from Neath (Court Sart) (NEATH) |
|
|