Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1178 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18981 Week
» 71997 Month
» 191524 Year
» 3218377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3707 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3417 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Bulldog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
162 |
Works Number |
2175 |
To Service |
During 06/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/04/1948 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
WLN |
Wellington |
m/e |
30/04/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1913 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1915 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3707 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2175 Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3417 |
|
|
09/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
02/1916 |
Naming |
Named 'Francis Mildmay' |
|
|
07/1923 |
Naming |
Renamed 'Lord Mildmay of Flete' |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) (Tys) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellington (WLN) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3417 |
|
|