Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1738 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15144 Week
» 68160 Month
» 187687 Year
» 3214540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3455 |
m/e |
01/1904 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3393 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
01/1904 |
AUSTRALIA |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Bulldog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
148 |
Works Number |
2038 |
To Service |
During 01/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/11/1949 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1904 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/11/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
4w/e |
23/03/1946 |
WDN |
WOS |
Worcester |
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1909 |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
08/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1915 |
Diagram D2 boiler fitted |
07/1917 |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
08/1917 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/10/1948 |
Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) |
On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3455, name: AUSTRALIA Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2038 Diagram D2 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1909 |
Modification |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3393 |
|
|
07/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram D2 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1917 |
Modification |
Diagram D3 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
28/11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3393 |
|
|