Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1309 |
m/e |
12/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4309 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) |
2126 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62126 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
204 |
Works Number |
753 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1897 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1948 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1897 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
08/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
on |
08/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
14/09/1947 |
WDN |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
13/08/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/10/1948 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1309 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 753 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4309 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2126 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2126 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62126 but not taken up |
|
|