Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1232 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15275 Week
» 80229 Month
» 282893 Year
» 3309746 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
896 |
m/e |
03/1908 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
15 |
Company History |
CambR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 15/04/1953 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1908 |
OSY |
|
Oswestry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
89B |
|
Brecon |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/04/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89B |
Brecon |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 896 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brecon (89B) |
|
|
15/04/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 896 |
|
|