Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 805 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14848 Week
» 79802 Month
» 282466 Year
» 3309319 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8665 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
British Railways |
48665 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/08/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8665 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48665 |
|
|
08/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48665 |
|
|
12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|