|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/11/1958 | Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) | 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, | SLS/195812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8547 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1954 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourton (20B) | ||
07/01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48547 | ||
02/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
03/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
05/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hasland (18C) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
18/03/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48547 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |