Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 925 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14331 Week
» 67347 Month
» 186874 Year
» 3213727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8534 |
m/e |
05/1945 |
British Railways |
48534 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 05/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/10/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8534 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48534 |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
21/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48534 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|