|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/10/1967 | Crewe South MPD (Withdrawn) | 45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. | SLS/196712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8521 Built at Doncaster Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) | ||
27/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
15/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48521 | ||
18/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) | ||
07/05/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48521 | ||
08/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |