Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1644 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19447 Week
» 72463 Month
» 191990 Year
» 3218843 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8515 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
British Railways |
48515 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/01/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8515 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48515 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (27B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48515 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|