Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4136 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17542 Week
» 70558 Month
» 190085 Year
» 3216938 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C12 |
m/e |
09/1942 |
British Railways |
33012 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 22/11/1964 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1942 |
GFD |
|
Guildford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
70C |
|
Guildford |
m/e |
14/09/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/11/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GFD |
Guildford |
5w/e |
11/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
14/09/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) |
In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C12 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33012 |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
22/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33012 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|