Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 296 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18099 Week
» 71115 Month
» 190642 Year
» 3217495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C9 |
m/e |
07/1942 |
British Railways |
33009 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 26/09/1965 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
9w/e |
26/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
14/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
06/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/09/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) |
In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. |
SLS/196303 |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C9 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33009 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
26/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33009 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|