Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2586 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
British Railways |
32586 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
E5X |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1955 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1903 |
RED |
|
Redhill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75A |
|
Brighton |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RED |
Redhill |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
TOSTORE |
RED |
Redhill |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
REINS |
75D |
Horsham |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1948 |
Eastbourne MPD |
Additional locomotives noted stored here in July were: 'D.1' 2283 and 'E5X' 32586, whilst of those previously stored, Nos. 2006/10/44 have proceeded to Eastleigh and No. 2397 to Ashford, for scrapping |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2586 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32586 |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32586 |
|
|