Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2913 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16319 Week
» 69335 Month
» 188862 Year
» 3215715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2507 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
British Railways |
32507 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/05/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1900 |
RED |
|
Redhill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75B |
|
Redhill |
4w/e |
19/03/1952 |
75A |
|
Brighton |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
TOSTORE |
75B |
Redhill |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
7w/e |
10/04/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. |
SLS/194807 |
16/06/1951 |
Brighton Works |
On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2507 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32507 |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32507 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|