Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2498 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
British Railways |
32498 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/11/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/11/1949 |
Brighton Works |
On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2498 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32498 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32498 |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|