Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2112 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19915 Week
» 72931 Month
» 192458 Year
» 3219311 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2484 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
British Railways |
32484 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/09/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2484 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32484 |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32484 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|