|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/01/1951 | Ashford Works | New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1905 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 2412 Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 32412 | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
09/1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/09/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 32412 |