Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2409 |
m/e |
12/1904 |
British Railways |
32409 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
E6 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/01/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NORW |
Norwood Junction |
m/e |
31/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2409 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32409 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
18/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32409 |
|
|
03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|