Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1459 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19262 Week
» 72278 Month
» 191805 Year
» 3218658 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2405 |
m/e |
11/1904 |
British Railways |
32405 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1904 |
3B |
|
Three Bridges |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
75G |
Eastbourne |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2405 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32405 |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32405 |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|