Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2234 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20037 Week
» 73053 Month
» 192580 Year
» 3219433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2404 |
m/e |
10/1904 |
British Railways |
32404 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
5w/e |
04/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
75G |
Eastbourne |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
75G |
Eastbourne |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2404 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32404 |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32404 |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|