Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2081 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15487 Week
» 68503 Month
» 188030 Year
» 3214883 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2400 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
British Railways |
32400 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1904 |
3B |
|
Three Bridges |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/12/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
3Br |
Three Bridges |
5w/e |
04/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2400 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32400 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32400 |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|