Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1469 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14875 Week
» 67891 Month
» 187418 Year
» 3214271 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2399 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
British Railways |
32399 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1953 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
75D |
Horsham |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
75E |
Three Bridges |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
9w/e |
26/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/06/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2399 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32399 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
07/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32399 |
|
|
10/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|