Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3830 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17236 Week
» 70252 Month
» 189779 Year
» 3216632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2286 |
m/e |
07/1879 |
British Railways |
32286 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1879 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1948 |
Service Life |
69 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1879 |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
q/e |
12/1935 |
HOR |
|
Horsham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
HOR |
|
Horsham |
P |
02/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
07/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HOR |
Horsham |
P |
02/01/1948 |
TOSTORE |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
WDN |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
on |
31/07/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/11/1942 |
Miscellaneous Notes |
Among the stock working on the Longmoor Ry. are American Tank WD.1260, and S.R. '0.1' 1046 (on goods) and 0-4-2T's 2240/86 (most favoured for passenger jobs). |
SLS/194302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1879 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2286 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2286 |
|
|
10/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32286 but not taken up |
|
|