Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1229 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19032 Week
» 72048 Month
» 191575 Year
» 3218428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2129 |
m/e |
10/1878 |
British Railways |
32129 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1878 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/06/1951 |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1878 |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
FRA |
Fratton |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1947 |
St Leonards MPD |
Locos. under or awaiting repair here on 21st November last included 'V' 900/6, 'C1' C28 TON, 'N1' 1877, '01' 1432, 'El' tank 2129 TON ex loan to Gypsum Mines. |
SLS/194801 |
10/07/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives under repair here (early July) included Nos. 919, 2129, S2301, 2415/77, 2547, 2644, 32576, W.D. 77101, while Nos. 34078-85 were in various stages of construction. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1878 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2129 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32129 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
31/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32129 |
|
|