Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26448 Week
» 125093 Month
» 327757 Year
» 3354610 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2128 |
m/e |
10/1878 |
British Railways |
32128 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1878 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1952 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/03/1952 |
Ashford Works |
32128 has been cut up at Ashford, while 32113, 148 an 157 await a similar fate. The last two are oil burners ex store and 170 an 172 were also noted en route for Ashford on 23/3/52. E6x 32407 has received new cylinders and heavy boiler repairs, E6 32414 has also received a general, while 2407 awaits her turn. The solitary lined out E3, 32166, is back' for shops and has been well looked after during the past two years as it is surprisingly clean. |
SLS/195206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1878 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2128 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32128 |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32128 |
|
|
04/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|