Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3619 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17025 Week
» 70041 Month
» 189568 Year
» 3216421 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2112 |
m/e |
04/1877 |
British Railways |
32112 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 04/1877 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/12/1949 |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1877 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2112 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32112 but not taken up |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2112 |
|
|
02/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|