Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2106 |
m/e |
09/1915 |
British Railways |
32106 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
E2 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1915 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/10/1962 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Engines under repair include 680s, 30914 Eastbourne, 32082, 32106, 32449, 32482, and 77296/90360. New construction-42070-78 and 34110; the tanks are due out at the rate of one per week commencing with 42070 on 27/10 up to 42078 on 22/12. Addendum: The engines mentioned as under repair were all dealt with during November, and further tanks laid down up to 42084. |
SLS/195012 |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Ex-works) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2106 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32106 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32106 |
|
|