Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1674 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15080 Week
» 68096 Month
» 187623 Year
» 3214476 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2094 |
m/e |
11/1883 |
British Railways |
32094 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
El Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1883 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1955 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. |
SLS/195108 |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2094 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32094 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32094 |
|
|
05/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|