Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1304 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24935 Week
» 89889 Month
» 292553 Year
» 3319406 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2084 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
British Railways |
32084 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1951 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 7 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1912 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3B |
|
Bushbury |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
BTN |
Brighton |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
Brighton Works |
The following were noted at Brighton in standard black livery, unlined with Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplates: Nos. 30425, 30951 (no smokebox numberplate), 32077/84, 32337/44/49, while No. 30806 was in Southern green, with Standard Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplate. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2084 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32084 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32084 |
|
|